Alturki, Faisal Ibrahim A (CPSO#: 105145)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 19 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017