Altweijri, Ikhlass Sulaiman A (CPSO#: 79243)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 20 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2003 to 04 Jul 2003
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 04 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011