Alvarez Courbis, Gonzalo Gustavo (CPSO#: 73453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Respiratory Medicine
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79294
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GONZALO GUSTAVO ALVAREZ COURBIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALVAREZ COURBIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004