Alvarez, German (CPSO#: 19649)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 28 May 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Laval University, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1965
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 28 May 1993

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 May 1993
Summary:

 In May 1993, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Alvarez guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 29(30) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient.  The Committee also found him incompetent, contrary to s. 61(4) of the 
 Health Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional care of a 
 patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a 
 nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice.  Consequently, the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Alvarez's licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Feb 1993


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Apr 1984
Summary:

 In April 1984, Dr. Alvarez pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a 
 patient.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Alvarez guilty of 
 professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Alvarez's licence to 
 practice be suspended for a period of twelve months.  During this period of suspension, Dr. 
 Alvarez was to undergo psychotherapy with a psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar, and was to 
 waive the right of confidentiality, so that his psychiatrist could submit reports of his progress 
 to the College after six and twelve months.  Provided that these conditions were met, and that the 
 psychiatrist submitted favourable reports, Dr. Alvarez's suspension was to be lifted at the end of 
 the twelve months.  The Committee further ruled that for a period of twenty-four months following 
 the end of the suspension, Dr. Alvarez's psychiatrist was to arrange a monitoring program of his 
 practice acceptable to the Registrar.  Failure to meet any of these conditions would result in the 
 revocation of Dr. Alvarez's licence.  The Committee also ordered that these penalties were to be 
 recorded on the Register, and it recommended that Dr. Alvarez(s name be published.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 06 Apr 1984