Alves, Philip Amaral (CPSO#: 100663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205-2209 Bloor St. W.
Toronto, ON
M6S 1N5
Toronto ON  M6S1N5
Phone: 647-347-7516
Fax: 647-347-7518
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alves Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Alves ( CPSO# 100663)

Business Address:
205 - 2209 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 1N5
Phone Number: (647) 347-7516

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP AMARAL ALVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALVES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015