Alvi, Mansour Isalou (CPSO#: 80889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Isalou Alvi, Mansour (used until: 11 Jan 2009 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Athlete's Care Clinic
Empress Walk
5095 Yonge Street
Ground Floor
Toronto ON  M2N 6Z4
Phone: (416) 757-2873
Fax: (416) 250-7730
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough, ON
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alvi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alvi ( CPSO# 80889 )

Business Address:
Athlete's Care
Empress Walk
5095 Yonge Street, Ground Floor
Suite A9
Toronto ON  M2N 6Z4
Phone Number: (416) 479-8743

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - West Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANSOUR ISALOU ALVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009