Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Alvi, Ruby Mumtaz (CPSO#: 69160)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: Alvi, Mumtaz (used until: 12 Sep 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Summerville Trillium
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
7th Floor
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-9900
Fax: (905) 272-9977
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ruby M. Alvi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Alvi ( CPSO# 69160 )

Business Address:
Summerville Trillium
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
101 Queensway West
7th Floor
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-9900

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUBY MUMTAZ ALVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALVI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1997