Alwaneen, Riyadh Saleh (CPSO#: 69760)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1995 to 14 Jan 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jan 1996 to 14 Jan 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997