Alyahya, Bader Abdulrahman I (CPSO#: 88197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
350 John St. N.
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone: 5145714412
Fax: (613)623-4844
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Pharmacology Effective: 13 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BADER ABDULRAHMAN I ALYAHYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALYAHYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 07 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 24 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2016