Alzahrani, Abdullah Saeed Mohammed Al-Qurashi (CPSO#: 80597)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2004 to 16 Jun 2004
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009