Alzahrani, Malak Ali M (CPSO#: 111809)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 May 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2017