Alzayed, Mohammed Fahad M (CPSO#: 84315)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2006 to 05 Jul 2006
PEAP - Resident - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2012