Alzubaidi, Ibrahim Hashem A (CPSO#: 110710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 18 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Khalid University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76207
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IBRAHIM HASHEM A ALZUBAIDI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALZUBAIDI is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. ALZUBAIDI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALZUBAIDI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALZUBAIDI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALZUBAIDI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALZUBAIDI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2016 to 17 Oct 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018