Amacher, Arthur Loren (CPSO#: 19723)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 19 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 1990