Amaladoss, Antony Sebastian Jesudoss (CPSO#: 85894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Jan 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
1401 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7R 3P9
Phone: (905) 333-4262
Fax: (905) 333-9262
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amaladoss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Amaladoss ( CPSO# 85894 )

Business Address:
2192 Argon Court
Burlington ON  L7R 4E6
Phone Number: (905) 633-7019

Business Address:
Unit 6
1401 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7R 3P9
Phone Number: (905) 333-4262

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1182 Northshore Boulevard East
Lower Level
Burlington ON  L7S 1C5
Phone Number: (905) 637-2586

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 Jan 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Aug 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Antony Sebastian Jesudoss Amaladoss may practise medicine independently in
            Psychiatry, only.