Amani, Neda (CPSO#: 72418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Names: Amani Golshani, Neda (used until: 27 Jul 2000 )     Amani, Neda (used until: 22 Jun 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Police Services
The Real You OPS Wellness Program
19 Fairmount Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1X4
Phone: (613) 236-1222 Ext. 4335
Fax: (613) 760-8133
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Avicenna Health Centre
Unit 100
80 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2N 2H4
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-0909
Fax: (416) 222-8292
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEDA AMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000