Amankwah, Kofi Sarpong (CPSO#: 23124)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English

Education:University of Alberta, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 11 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015