Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Amar, Charles (CPSO#: 70838)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 416
960 St-Croix Boulevard
Ville St-Laurent QC  H4L 3Y8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999