Amara, Ibrahim Benjamin (CPSO#: 33801)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Apr 2002