Amaratunga, Ruwan Trishantha (CPSO#: 89095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Ottawa Sleep Centre
Suite 303
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 722-9900
Fax: (613) 722-9100
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
Cardiopulmonary Department
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 748-4603
Fax: (613) 907-8023
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Amaratunga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Amaratunga ( CPSO# 89095 )

Business Address:
West Ottawa Sleep Centre
Unit 303
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 722-9900

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUWAN TRISHANTHA AMARATUNGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMARATUNGA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012