Amariyen, Dawi Hassin M (CPSO#: 84205)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Garyounis University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2006 to 27 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 28 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 24 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2016