Amato, Dominick Joseph (CPSO#: 23443)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Oct 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Michigan, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Program for Gaucher Disease
60 Murray Street
Room L3-415
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5189
Fax: (416) 586-4677
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 17 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOMINICK JOSEPH AMATO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMATO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Sep 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1977