Ambinathan, Jaya Prakash Nath (CPSO#: 110530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 20 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (647) 892-5031
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAYA PRAKASH NATH AMBINATHAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AMBINATHAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AMBINATHAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AMBINATHAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AMBINATHAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. AMBINATHAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. AMBINATHAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Sep 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018