Ambis, Christopher John (CPSO#: 74684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 310
15 Mountain Avenue South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V6
Phone: (905) 664-3730
Fax: (905) 664-9921
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

337 Hamilton Regional Rd 8
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1E7
Canada
Phone: (905) 664-2251
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Ambis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ambis ( CPSO# 74684 )

Business Address:
310 - 15 Mountain Avenue South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V6
Phone Number: (905) 664-3730

Business Address:
Clarion Nursing Home
337 Highway # 8
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1E7
Phone Number: (905) 664-2281

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN AMBIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMBIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2002