Ambusaidi, Aamal Abdulla Sulaiman (CPSO#: 102609)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Feb 2014 to 25 Apr 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jan 2015
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2016