Amdemichael, Esiahas (CPSO#: 62458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 26
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone: (519) 578-1332
Fax: (519) 578-1399
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dynacare
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-3000
Fax: (905) 790-9659
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Esiahas Amdemichael, Dr. Ana Nikolic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nikolic ( CPSO# 69192 )
Dr. E. Amdemichael ( CPSO# 62458 )

Business Address:
Suite 26
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone Number: (519) 578-1332

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESIAHAS AMDEMICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMDEMICHAEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991