Amed, Shazhan (CPSO#: 80849)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2008