Ameli, Fraydoone Michael (CPSO#: 23283)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St. Michaels Hospital 30 Bond Street Toronto, ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 28 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014