Amer, Emad El-Din (CPSO#: 54933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1984

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Professional Building
Suite 511
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-7999
Fax: (905) 820-7991
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  April 18, 2008
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF PRIVILEGES: On May 16, 2008 Credit Valley Hospital notified the College that Dr. Emad Amer's privileges at this hospital were suspended, effective April 18, 2008.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 May 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMAD EL-DIN AMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1984

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Oct 2011
Summary:

 On October 26, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Emad ElDin Amer committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

In 2008, Dr. Amer became involved in a 
 confrontation with members of the Credit Valley Hospital's security staff when he was unable to 
 access his belongings from the doctors' lounge. He banged forcefully at the security office door, 
 breaking the security office's door frame. When the door was opened, Dr. Amer entered the office. 
 His actions were captured on a video recording. Staff report that they felt intimidated by Dr. 
 Amer's inappropriate words and actions while in the security office.  

The Discipline Committee 
 ordered and directed that:

1.	Dr. Amer appear before the panel to be reprimanded;

2.	Dr. Amer 
 pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00, within 60 days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 26, 2011