Amer, Rebecca Kathleen (CPSO#: 80748)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Firestone Bldg, 2nd Floor
Rm T2132
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 32177
Fax: (905) 521-6183
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Amer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Amer ( CPSO# 80748 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
Firestone Building, 2nd Floor
Room T2132
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 04 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA KATHLEEN AMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2008