Amer, Tehmina (CPSO#: 86839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ancaster Medical Centre
103-1144 Wilson St. West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone: (905) 304-8001
Fax: (905) 304-8004
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Terrace Hill St.
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: 519-751-5544
Fax: 519-751-5824
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Amer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Amer ( CPSO# 86839 )

Business Address:
103 - 1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 304-8001

Business Address:
Brantford General
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TEHMINA AMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 27 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2014