Ames, Elizabeth Mary (CPSO#: 63793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: Hajcsar, Elizabeth Mary (used until: 27 May 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
384 Guelph Line
Burlington ON  L7R 3L4
Phone: (289) 337-9628
Fax: (289) 337-9628
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Ames Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ames ( CPSO# 63793 )

Business Address:
384 Guelph Line
Burlington ON  L7R 3L4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH MARY AMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1992