Ames, Nelson (CPSO#: 46544)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Sep 1988