Amid, Ali (CPSO#: 95071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont.
Division of Pediatric Hematology
and Oncology
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737 7600
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Haematology/Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI AMID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMID is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 May 2011 to 03 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2014