Amin, Shilpa (CPSO#: 73115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: Jain, Shilpa (used until: 08 Sep 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone: (905) 634-4440
Fax: (905) 639-3810
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 - 4271 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2P 2X7
Canada
Phone: (519) 650-0011
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amin and Karnis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Faghih ( CPSO# 78171 )
Dr. M. Karnis ( CPSO# 66995 )
Dr. S. Amin ( CPSO# 73115 )

Business Address:
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone Number: (905) 333-6355


Corporation Name: Shilpa Amin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amin ( CPSO# 73115 )

Business Address:
One Fertility
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone Number: (905) 634-4440


Corporation Name: Akinsooto, Amin, Faghih and Karnis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Akinsooto ( CPSO# 88164 )
Dr. M. Faghih ( CPSO# 78171 )
Dr. M. Karnis ( CPSO# 66995 )
Dr. S. Amin ( CPSO# 73115 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
4271 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2P 2X7
Phone Number: (519) 650-0011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHILPA AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Oct 1998 to 16 Dec 1998
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 1999 to 20 Oct 1999
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Nov 1999 to 15 Dec 1999
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2002