Amin, Shreyasee (CPSO#: 64070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mayo Clinic
200 First Street South West
Rochester MN  55905
United States
Phone: (507) 284-8450
Fax: (507) 284-0564

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 24 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHREYASEE AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1992