Amir, Mohammad Faisal (CPSO#: 88145)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 14 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25-B Great Lakes Dr
Mississauga ON  L5M 7R1
Phone: (905) 494-0302
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammad Faisal Amir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Amir ( CPSO# 88145 )

Business Address:
25B Great Lakes Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 2K7
Phone Number: (905) 494-0203

Business Address:
820 Main Street
Milton ON  L9T 0J4

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 10 Mar 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 02 Jun 2008 to 09 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 10 Mar 2009 to 09 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2017