Amirjani, Nasim (CPSO#: 85418)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2006 to 23 Aug 2006
Elective Trainee - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Sep 2007 to 12 Dec 2007
Elective Trainee - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 28 May 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2008