Amjad, Asma (CPSO#: 72208)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1595 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K2G 3K2
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 680-6420
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 9S1
Canada
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 680-6420
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amjad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Amjad ( CPSO# 72208 )
Dr. A. Kabir ( CPSO# 72680 )

Business Address:
308 Palladium Drive
Suite 200
Kanata ON  K2V 1A1
Phone Number: (613) 599-8132

Business Address:
2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 9S1
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Business Address:
1596 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z5
Phone Number: (613) 688-3184

Business Address:
1595 Merivale Road
Suite 1A-2
Ottawa ON  K2G 3K2
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASMA AMJAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMJAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 06 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 07 Mar 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 06 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001