Amornputtisathaporn, Naparat (CPSO#: 91849)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mahidol University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 13 Jul 2009 to 28 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Queen's University, 29 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2011