Amos, Kirsten Katharina (CPSO#: 80591)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Eberhard Karls University at Tubingen, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2004 to 29 May 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004