Amundson, Heather Jean (CPSO#: 58362)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: South Georgian Bay Community Health Centre 14 Ramblewood Drive, Unit 202 Wasaga Beach, Ontario L9Z 0C4
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2017