Anago, Anthony Elochukwu (CPSO#: 105452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Igbo

Education:NNAMDI AZIKIWE UNIVERSITY, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: 5193516144 Ext. 5744
Fax: 5193510450
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Anago Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Anago ( CPSO# 105452)

Business Address:
Chatham-Ketn Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland
New Brunswick
Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY ELOCHUKWU ANAGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAGO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2016