Anand, Jagdish Rai (CPSO#: 75190)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunridge Professional Building
Suite 505
2675 36 Street Northeast
Calgary AB  T1Y 6H6
Phone: (403) 452-6384
Fax: (403) 452-6418

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 14 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAGDISH RAI ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2003