Anand, Navin (CPSO#: 59732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 309
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 607-9848
Fax: (905) 607-9849
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Navin Anand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Anand ( CPSO# 59732 )

Business Address:
309 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 607-9848

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVIN ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1989