Anand, Nitasha (CPSO#: 82678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Professional Arts Building
Suite 401
100 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Y9
Phone: (705) 326-2443
Fax: (705) 326-2444
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Anand ( CPSO# 82678 )

Business Address:
Orillia Professional Arts Building
Suite 401
100 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Y9
Phone Number: (705) 326-2443

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 23 Nov 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NITASHA ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009