Anand, Parvesh Kumar (CPSO#: 26818)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Mar 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Lucknow, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Parvesh Anand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Mar 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Feb 1989
Summary:

 In February 1989, Dr. Anand pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of 
 practice of the profession.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Anand 
 guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Anand be 
 reprimanded, with the fact of reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee further 
 ruled that a restriction be imposed on the Doctor's licence, such that he be prohibited from 
 practicing medicine except under supervision in his present course of studies in vascular surgery 
 and critical care medicine, or in another course in an approved medical school.  It was stipulated 
 that this restriction be in place until such time as Dr. Anand successfully completed the course 
 he was currently taking in vascular surgery, until he completed a further year of remedial 
 training in general surgery in a centre approved by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons 
 of Canada, and until the quarterly In-Training Evaluation Reports demonstrated to the satisfaction 
 of the Registrar that the Doctor's performance was satisfactory.   Lastly, the Committee ordered 
 that the restriction on Dr. Anand's licence be recorded on the Register.  In a further hearing on 
 8 January 1992, the Discipline Committee varied the penalty imposed on Dr. Anand to require that 
 he undertake refresher training in general surgery for a further period of six months at an 
 appropriate teaching hospital satisfactory to the Registrar, after which his Certificate of 
 Registration would be restored without restriction, provided that he supplied the Registrar with a 
 written opinion from a senior surgeon stating that he could independently assess and deal with 
 emergency situations in an acceptable and standard manner.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 23 Feb 1989

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 26, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Parvesh Kumar Anand to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 26, 2016:

Dr. Anand was the subject of a College investigation into allegations that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Anand has ceased to engage in the performance of any and all surgical procedures including office-based surgical procedures. In addition, Dr. Anand has undertaken to resign from the College effective March 26, 2016, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

See PDF for full Undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)