Anand, Sonia Savitri (CPSO#: 65167)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
M D C L Room 3204
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 21523
Fax: (905) 528-2814
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 40320
Fax: 9055282814
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sonia S. Anand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sergeant ( CPSO# 66607 )
Dr. S. Anand ( CPSO# 65167 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
MDCL Room 3204
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 719-3926


Corporation Name: M. Sergeant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sergeant ( CPSO# 66607 )
Dr. S. Anand ( CPSO# 65167 )

Business Address:
St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 777-3837

Business Address:
Wayside House
15 Charlton Avenue West
Hamilton ON  L8P 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 777-3837

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONIA SAVITRI ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993