Anand, Sumeet Mohan (CPSO#: 90093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
520 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 673-9393 Ext. 1
Fax: (416) 673-9394
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sumeet Anand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Anand ( CPSO# 90093 )

Business Address:
Suite 401
520 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 673-9393

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUMEET MOHAN ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2009 to 16 Jan 2009
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2012