Anand, Sundaram Vivek (CPSO#: 54314)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Agra University, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 29 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014